Sullivan v. Chase Home Finance, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christa P.C. Sullivan
Defendant: Chase Home Finance, LLC, Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation, Chase Bank USA, N.A., Advanta Mortgage Corp. USA, Advanta National Bank and Swiss Reinsurance Company Limited
Case Number: 3:2009cv02876
Filed: June 25, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Illston denying 90 Motion to Appear by Telephone (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER continuing cmc to 6/2/10 @ 10:30 a.m. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER continuing motions and cmc to 5/7/10 at 9 a.m. and 3:00 p.m., respectively (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER adjusting litigation schedule (see order for new dates) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting partial dismissal without prejudice. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER continuing all motions to 3/19/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER extending Initial Disclosure deadline re 53 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF SWISS REINSURANCE AND ADVANTA LIFE INS. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Chase Home Finance, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christa P.C. Sullivan
Represented By: Edward Gerard Mannion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance, LLC
Represented By: S. Christopher Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: S. Christopher Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: S. Christopher Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanta Mortgage Corp. USA
Represented By: Peter James Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanta National Bank
Represented By: Peter James Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swiss Reinsurance Company Limited
Represented By: Leah M. Quadrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?