Lucero v. American Home Mortgage Serving, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tony A. Lucero
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Serving, Inc., American Home Mortgage Acceptance, Inc., AHMSI Default Services Inc. and Citibank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2009cv02879
Filed: June 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Order by Hon. Charles R. Breyer granting 68 Motion for Release of Bond Obligation. The Clerk of the Court shall release the full amount of the bond proceeds to Plaintiff TONY LUCERO or Plaintiff's counsel, Christine Gardas.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/24/2011. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 57 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re 44 Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/22/2010. (crblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer conditionally granting 39 Motion to Set Aside Judgment (crblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 JUDGMENT in favor of defendant and against plaintiff. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/29/2010. (crblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010) Modified on 4/30/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/8/2010. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO SUPPRESS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/16/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S AUGUST 21, 2009 FILING. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/24/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/11/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucero v. American Home Mortgage Serving, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony A. Lucero
Represented By: Christine Ann Gardas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Serving, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Christopher McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Acceptance, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Christopher McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHMSI Default Services Inc.
Represented By: Charles Christopher McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Charles Christopher McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?