Smith v. American Airlines Inc.
Plaintiff: Laurie Smith
Defendant: American Airlines Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv02903
Filed: June 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DISMISSING CASE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 28, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT [re 67 Notice (Other) filed by American Airlines Inc.]. All deadlines remain in effect until dismissal is filed. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/12/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES, NOS. 1-9. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 24, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/15/2010. Jury Trial set for 4/4/2011 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motions due by 10/28/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 22, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 21, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 51 Letter filed by Laurie Smith]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/18/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 14, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S LETTER DATED MAY 24, 2010 [re 45 Letter filed by Laurie Smith]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/25/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE AND RULE 35 DISCLOSURES. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 1, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 25, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 10, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 30 Order]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/5/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING MEDIATION DEADLINE [re 24 Stipulation filed by Laurie Smith]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/3/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT AMERICAN AIRLINE, INC.'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 8 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. American Airlines Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Smith
Represented By: Louis Stanton Franecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Inc.
Represented By: Kymberly E. Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?