Abdullah v. Accentcare Long Term Disability Plan
Plaintiff: Salima Abdullah
Defendant: Accentcare Long Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 3:2009cv02909
Filed: June 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISMISSAL. The action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 20, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DATE FOR FILING JOINT STATEMENT. The joint statement is due on or before November 9, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 2, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING 19 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT; DENYING DEFENDANT'S CROSS-MOTION FOR JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 19, 2012. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER REGARDING REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 19, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DETERMINING APPLICABLE STANDARD OF REVIEW. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 27, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION REQUESTING ORDER SHORTENING TIME. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker for Maxine M. Chesney on July 14, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 30 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ADDITIONAL BRIEF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 4, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE: June 4, 2010 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 1, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 13, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DATE TO COMPLETE ADR. The previous deadline of January 5, 2010 is extended up to and including January 21, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 22, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SELECTING ADR PROCESS. The parties shall participate in mediation within 90 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 7, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdullah v. Accentcare Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salima Abdullah
Represented By: Laurence Fred Padway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accentcare Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?