Yakes v. Chase Manhattan Bank USA, N.A.
Plaintiff: Mary Jane Yakes
Defendant: Chase Manhattan Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2009cv02964
Filed: July 1, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by Acting Chairman of the MDL Panel, Robert L. Miller, Jr. on 06/07/2010. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE OF REFERENCE FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/24/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 20, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 14, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR A STAY AND RESCHEDULING HEARING FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 13, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DENYING RELIEF REQUESTED IN LETTER DATED A0RIL 9, 2010, AND VACATING HEARINGS [re 69 Letter filed by Chase Manhattan Bank USA, N.A.]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/12/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 69 Letter filed by Chase Manhattan Bank USA, N.A.]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/9/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO STAY AND SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Alsup granting 65 Motion to Shorten Time (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DEFER BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Alsup denying 54 Motion to Continue (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 59 Letter filed by Mary Jane Yakas]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/31/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF MICHAEL G. SALEMI by Judge Alsup granting 51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER TO SUBMIT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENTS IN.PDF FORMAT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/8/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ***FILED IN WRONG CASE - PLEASE DISREGARD*** ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 25, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010) Modified on 1/25/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge William Alsup [granting 18 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE REGARDING ORAL ARGUMENT ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 9, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. THERE WILL BE NO MORE EXTENSIONS. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/20/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yakes v. Chase Manhattan Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jane Yakes
Represented By: Frank J. Janecek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Manhattan Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?