Dowdy v. Curry
Petitioner: Gregory L. Dowdy
Respondent: Ben Curry
Case Number: 3:2009cv03144
Filed: July 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 80 Motion for Certificate of Appealability.(whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/31/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 REMINDER AND ORDER RE EVIDENTIARY HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/16/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER RESCHEDULING EVIDENTIARY HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/14/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SECOND ORDER RE EVIDENTIARY HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/8/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE EVIDENTIARY HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/1/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND EVIDENTIARY HEARING re 53 Status Report filed by Ben Curry. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/13/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER RE PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT UNDER FRCP 60(B) re 42 MOTION Relief From Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R. Civ.P. 60(b) filed by Gregory L. Dowdy. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/2/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PETITIONER'S RULE 60 MOTION (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RE MEDICAL RECORDS AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT re 21 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Gregory L. Dowdy. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/31/13. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RE HEARING SET FOR JANUARY 31 (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT UNDER FRCP 60(B) (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dowdy v. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory L. Dowdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ben Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?