Ulin v. Lovell's Antique Gallery et al
Plaintiff: Juan Bonifacio Ulin
Defendant: Lovell's Antique Gallery and Abraham Magidish
Case Number: 3:2009cv03160
Filed: October 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 WRIT of Execution issued as to Judgment Debtor Abraham Magadish aka Abraham Avi Magadish aka Avi Magadish and Judgment Debtor Lovell's Antique Gallery in the amount of $42,718.54 (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 194 WRIT of Execution issued as to Judgment Debtor Abraham Magadish aka Abraham Avi Magadish aka Avi Magadish in the amount of $28,032.21 (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 192 WRIT of Execution issued against Abraham Magadish in the amount of $28,032.21 (mclS, COURT STAFF)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Judge Laporte granting in part and denying in part 150 Motion for Attorney Fees (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER REMOVING DOCKET NOS. 155 AND 156 FROM PUBLIC DOCKET. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 09/19/2011. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 135 Motion to Alter Judgment; signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 8/19/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER AWARDING DAMAGES FOLLOWING BENCH TRIAL; DENYING Request for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration 130 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER REGARDING DAMAGES FOLLOWING BENCH TRIAL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/8/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING ON DAMAGES. Signed by Judge Laporte on 2/23/11. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Laporte on 11/24/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING ON FALSE DOCUMENTS ISSUE. Signed by Judge Laporte on 10/27/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge Laporte granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion to Compel (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Laporte granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 50 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 52 Motion to Bifurcate (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Laporte granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Laporte denying 59 Motion for Extension of Time for Deposition of Kevin Mills (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/27/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Laporte granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Compel (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re 29 Stipulation filed by Juan Bonifacio Ulin. Signed by Judge Laporte on 6/3/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re 25 Stipulation filed by Juan Bonifacio Ulin AS MODIFIED. Signed by Judge Laporte on 5/13/2010. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SUBSTITUTING Attorney Shelley S Buchanan for Defendants Abraham Magidish and Lovell's Antique Gallery re 18 . Attorneys John Michael Harding and Kevin Anthony Mills terminated. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/23/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING Case Management Conference for 12/15/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/20/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 10/19/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009) Modified on 10/22/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ulin v. Lovell's Antique Gallery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Bonifacio Ulin
Represented By: Adam Lee Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lovell's Antique Gallery
Represented By: Shelley Susan Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham Magidish
Represented By: Shelley Susan Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?