Contreras v. JP Morgan Chase Bank et al
Plaintiff: Nelida Contreras
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, Washington Mutual Bank, Noemi Nunez, WAMU Employee No. 2, Garcia Marketing, LLC, Henry Garcia and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank
Case Number: 3:2009cv03176
Filed: July 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 12:1821 Default of Loan by Promissary Note
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE CLAIMS AGAINST THE FDIC AS RECEIVER FOR WASHINGTON MUTUAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 9, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 JUDGMENT AGAINST JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 14, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER RE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AND DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE'S WITHDRAWAL OF ACCEPTANCE OF RULE 68 OFFER. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 21, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER RE DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.'S MOTION TO VACATE ACCEPTANCE OF OFFER OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 20, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE (MAY 21, 2010) [re 46 Letter, filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/17/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 29, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 14, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 11 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 9, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras v. JP Morgan Chase Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelida Contreras
Represented By: John Frederick Mounier, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noemi Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAMU Employee No. 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia Marketing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?