Hartmann v. Hanson et al
Plaintiff: Dan Hartmann
Defendant: Christian Hanson, Eleven Unknown Deputy United States Marshals, Riverside County, Rod Pacheco, David Brian Greenberg, Hawlee Kane Larson, Armando Munoz and Carren Robinson
Case Number: 3:2009cv03227
Filed: July 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 2, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER AWARDING SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 23, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER FINALIZING JANUARY 22 ORDER AND DISMISSING DEFENDANT HANSON FROM CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 4, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT HANSON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Alsup granting 20 Motion to Dismiss (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 7, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 5, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND VACATING HEARING Show Cause Response due by 12/24/2009.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 18, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/7/2010 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by noon on 1/4/2010. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/10/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO DECEMBER 10, 2009, AT 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/29/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Continue]. CMC continued to December 3, 2009, at 11:00 a.m. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartmann v. Hanson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Hartmann
Represented By: David Lynn Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleven Unknown Deputy United States Marshals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Brian Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawlee Kane Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carren Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?