Outlaw v. Potter
Plaintiff: Martha A. Outlaw
Defendant: John E. Potter
Case Number: 3:2009cv03262
Filed: July 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 15, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF COMPROMISE AND SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 10, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Plaintiff's claims alleged against defendant are dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party shall certify that the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the dismissal shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 29, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: CONFIDENTIALITY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 23, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/18/2009. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued from October 23, 2009 to December 18, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 21, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Outlaw v. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha A. Outlaw
Represented By: Stephen J. Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?