Jozinovich v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Ante Jozinovich
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association and California Reconveyance Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv03326
Filed: July 21, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for defendants to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/01/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 1/14/2010 Granting re 10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER setting briefing and hearing schedule on 10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 12/07/09. Reply due 12/14/09. Hearing scheduled for 01/11/10 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/18/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and ORDER continuing reply deadline and hearing on 9 Plaintiff's motion to remand. Plaintiff's reply due 10/08/09. Show cause response, if any, due 10/08/09. Motion hearing and show cause hearing set for 10/26/09. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/01/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER vacating briefing and hearing schedule on 10 Defendants' Motion to dismiss and vacating initial case management conference date. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/26/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend time to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/11/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jozinovich v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ante Jozinovich
Represented By: Michael Patrick Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: John M. Sorich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company
Represented By: John M. Sorich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?