Javier v. Philippine Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Leonila M. Javier and Pedro Javier
Defendant: Philippine Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv03398
Filed: July 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting 82 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 2, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 77 Motion for Approval of Settlement (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re 70 Stipulation filed by Philippine Airlines, Inc. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 08/03/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 31 Motion to Strike ; denying 47 Motion to Continue (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/9/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE: APRIL 1, 2010 LETTER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Compel (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 12, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AMENDED ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS (Correction of Trial date due to holiday). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/2/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/2/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re 5 Stipulation, filed by Philippine Airlines, Inc.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/16/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Javier v. Philippine Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonila M. Javier
Represented By: David Lee Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Javier
Represented By: David Lee Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philippine Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?