Conlan V. Cutera
Plaintiff: Peter Conlan
Defendant: Cutera
Case Number: 3:2009cv03406
Filed: July 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 6, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/2/2009. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO RESCHEDULE OCTOBER 30, 2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND EXTENSION ON TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Defendant shall have an extension of time to answer plaintiff's complaint to Friday, October 9, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 8, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conlan V. Cutera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Conlan
Represented By: Cliff Michael Palefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?