Ringcentral, Inc. v. One Number Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ringcentral, Inc.
Defendant: One Number Corporation and Brandon D. McLarty
Case Number: 3:2009cv03415
Filed: July 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statutes
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO PERMIT FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Any Second Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than March 12, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 25, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 24, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conferencecurrently scheduled for January 22, 2010 is continued to February 26, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 19, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING 21 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND 25 MOTION TO TEMPORARILY STAY PROCEEDINGS. The November 20, 2009 hearing on the motions is vacated, and the November 13, 2009 Case Management Conference is continued to January 22, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 4, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER VACATING OCTOBER 23, 2009 HEARING 20 ; DENYING AS MOOT 15 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 14, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. A hearing on the motion is scheduled for October 23, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 11, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ringcentral, Inc. v. One Number Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ringcentral, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Lee Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Number Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon D. McLarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?