Madrigal et al v. Onewest Bank et al
Plaintiff: Edward Madrigal and Teresa Madrigal
Defendant: Onewest Bank and United Financial Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 3:2009cv03436
Filed: July 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Onewest Bank, United Financial Mortgage Corporation against Edward Madrigal, Teresa Madrigal, the motion to dismiss is hereby GRANTED, and the First Amended Complaint is, as against OWB, hereby DISMISSED with prejudice and without leave to amend. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ONEWEST BANK'S MOTION TO DISMISS; DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AGAINST ONEWEST BANK WITH PREJUDICE; VACATING HEARING; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 9, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from January 29, 2010 to April 9, 2010. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than April 2, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 27, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT UNITED FINANCIAL MORTGAGE CORPORATION. Plaintiffs' claims against United Financial Mortgage Corporation are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 28, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT UNITED FINANCIAL MORTGAGE CORPORATION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE. Plaintiffs are ordered to show cause, in writing and no later than December 23, 2009, why plaintiffs' claims against United Financial should not be dismissed for failure to serve within the time required by Rule 4(m). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 3, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 19, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ONEWEST BANK'S MOTION TO DISMISS; DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; VACATING HEARING; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The complaint is dismissed. In the event that the Madrigals can, in good faith, amend t heir complaint to cure the deficiencies identified, any First Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than November 13, 2009. The Case Management Conference is continued from November 13, 2009 to January 29, 2010; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than January 22, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 21, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madrigal et al v. Onewest Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Madrigal
Represented By: Tiffany Lauren Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Madrigal
Represented By: Tiffany Lauren Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onewest Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Financial Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?