Van Curen v. Federal Crop Insurance Corporation et al
Plaintiff: John Van Curen
Defendant: Federal Crop Insurance Corporation and Risk Management Agency
Case Number: 3:2009cv03509
Filed: July 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re 22 Amended MOTION to Dismiss. The clerk is DIRECTED administratively to terminate all motions and close the file. The hearing scheduled for 7/6/10 is VACATED. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2010)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS from 6/10 to 7/1/2010 at 10:00 AM re doc 30 filed by John Van Curen; Pla's opposition due by 6/10; reply by 6/18. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/24/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 25 Letter filed by John Van Curen, 26 Letter filed by Risk Management Agency, Federal Crop Insurance Corporation, 28 Letter filed by John Van Curen (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting doc 16 filed by John Van Curen allowing filing of amended complaint on or before 2/5/2010 and establishing timetable for responsive pleadings relating thereto. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/2/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS to 2/25/2010 at 10:00 AM re doc 14 filed by John Van Curen. The parties' stipulation includes an agreement to postpone the filing dates for plaintiff's opposition and defendant's reply papers to correspond to the new hearing date. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 12/30/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER POSTPONING ALL CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES pending the decision on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re doc 12 filed by Risk Management Agency, Federal Crop Insurance Corporation. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/9/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Curen v. Federal Crop Insurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Van Curen
Represented By: David Clarke Sugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Crop Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Risk Management Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?