Johnson et al v. Hewlett-Packard Company
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Johnson, Jennifer Riese and Shaun Simmons
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv03596
Filed: August 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 317 Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration; granting in part and denying in part 284 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2014).
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER granting 310 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 284 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees , Responses due by 4/25/2014. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/15/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 280 Motion for Settlement and RE Applicability of Amended Cal. Labor Code Section 218.5. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER re 288 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear and Decide its Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Hewlett-Packard Company, 280 MOTION for Settlement Enforcement filed by Jennifer Riese, James Purvis, Jeffrey Johnson, Shaun Simmons. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/11/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER deferring briefing and hearing. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/25/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER re 259 Stipulation, filed by Jennifer Riese, James Purvis, Jeffrey Johnson, Shaun Simmons. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/30/2011. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER Denying Motion to Amend and Granting Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on August 12, 2011. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER re Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on July 8, 2011. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER re Stipulation. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on July 5, 2011. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER'S DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 9. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/27/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 173 Motion for Extension of Time to File (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 REFERRAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/7/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman vacating 118 Motion to Compel (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER RE DISCOVERY REFEREE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/1/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DISCOVERY MOTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/19/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NINTH DISCOVERY ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/16/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER regarding the filing of defendant's amended answer to plaintiff's third amended complaint re 98 Stipulation filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/1/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/18/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion to Compel (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/21/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 FIFTH DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/15/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER re 73 Letter filed by Jennifer Riese, Jeffrey Kossick, James Purvis, Michael Debever, Jeffrey Johnson, Shaun Simmons. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/13/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/9/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/12/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to Strike ; denying in part and finding as moot in part 46 Motion to Dismiss (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to extend time to respond to complaint re 12 Stipulation filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/6/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Hewlett-Packard Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Johnson
Represented By: Barry Ira Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Riese
Represented By: Barry Ira Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Simmons
Represented By: Barry Ira Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?