Dominguez et al v. Excel Manufacturing Co Inc
Plaintiff: Juan Dominguez and Juana Dominguez
Defendant: Excel Manufacturing Co Inc
Case Number: 3:2009cv03611
Filed: August 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Laporte denying 75 Motion to Strike (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Laporte granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion for Summary Judgment (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Laporte denying 41 Motion to Bifurcate (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Letter Request for Continuance of Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule 57 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/1/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Laporte granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Compel (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REGARDING CERTIFICATION OF FACTS SUPPORTING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF CONTEMPT. Signed by Judge Laporte on 8/25/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CERTIFICATION OF FACTS SUPPORTING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF CONTEMPT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/11/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re 36 Letter filed by Excel Manufacturing Co Inc, 33 Letter filed by Juan Dominguez, Juana Dominguez. Signed by Judge Laporte on 8/12/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re 28 Amended MOTION to Compel Initial Disclosures 27 MOTION to Compel 29 Letter 26 Ex Parte Application To Shorten Time. Signed by Judge Laporte on 6/11/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominguez et al v. Excel Manufacturing Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Dominguez
Represented By: Julio J Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Dominguez
Represented By: Julio J Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excel Manufacturing Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?