FMC Corporation Inc v. Evergreen Pulp Inc. et al
Plaintiff: FMC Corporation Inc
Defendant: Evergreen Pulp Inc., USLM Acquisition Inc, HKLM Acquisition Inc and Freshwater Pulp Co LLC
Case Number: 3:2009cv03618
Filed: August 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER STRIKING ANSWER 11 to Complaint filed by HKLM Acquisition Inc, USLM Acquisition Inc; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/14/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/10/2010 03:00 PM, before the Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/31/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 14 19 Motions to Withdraw as Attorney; Attorneys Amelia Fairbank Burroughs and William Timothy Needham deemed withdrawn (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING 23 REQUEST to appear telephonically; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/13/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FMC Corporation Inc v. Evergreen Pulp Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FMC Corporation Inc
Represented By: Michael Richard Simmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evergreen Pulp Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USLM Acquisition Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HKLM Acquisition Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freshwater Pulp Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?