Board of Trustees of the Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Second Generation Roofing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Pacific Coast Roofers Pension Plan, East Bay/North Bay Roofers Vacation Trust Fund, Bay Area Counties Roofing Industry Promotion Fund, Bay Area Counties Roofing Industry Apprenticeship Training Fund and Bruce Lau
Defendant: Second Generation Roofing, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv03634
Filed: August 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/10/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting re 18 Letter filed by Second Generation Roofing, Inc., for Mark Jordan to appear telephonically at the case management conference & OSC hearing on 12/18/9 at 2:00 PM. Court to initiate the phone contact. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/11/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER EXPUNGING re 13 Order to Show Cause as to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/03/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/18/2009 at 01:30 PM and Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/16/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO REFER MATTER TO MEDIATION. Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/04/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Second Generation Roofing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Coast Roofers Pension Plan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Bay/North Bay Roofers Vacation Trust Fund
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Area Counties Roofing Industry Promotion Fund
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Area Counties Roofing Industry Apprenticeship Training Fund
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Lau
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Second Generation Roofing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?