Williams v. Ahlin
Petitioner: Michael B Williams
Respondent: Pam Ahlin
Case Number: 3:2009cv03642
Filed: August 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 15, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT : The petition is hereby DISMISSED. The dismissal is without prejudice to petitioners filing a new federal habeas petition once his state civil commitment proceedings are completed and he has exhausted his state court remedies as to all claims he wishes to raise in federal court. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, CASE TRANSFERRED to District of Northern California. signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/30/2009. (Figueroa, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Ahlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael B Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pam Ahlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?