Doe et al v. Willits Charter School et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe and Kristen D
Defendant: Willits Charter School, Sally Rulison and Clint Smith
Case Number: 3:2009cv03655
Filed: August 10, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT TO BE ISSUED IN NAME OF MINOR PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-MOTIONS TO SEAL DEFENDANTS' MOTION (DOC 206) IDENTIFY OF PLAINTIFF AND TO RE-TAX COSTS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/13/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 35 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and GRANTING 118 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 187 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE EXPERT DEPOSITION SCHEDULE re 186 Stipulation filed by Sally Rulison, Willits Charter School. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/1/10. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER VACATING HEARING on Defendant Willits Unified School District's Motion for Attorney Fees 143 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/8/2010. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON WILLITS CHARTER SCHOOL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/28/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER Granting as Modified 170 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 8, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER re 164 Stipulation filed by Sally Rulison, Willits Charter School. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/24/10. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE OF REFERENCE OF 143 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Willits Unified School District AND ORDER RE MOTION PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/9/10. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER re production of privilege logs and scheduling of 133 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Jane Doe. Hearing set for 8/12/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/27/10. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER GRANTING 103 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/14/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER resetting hearing on 133 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Jane Doe. Discovery Hearing set for 8/26/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/13/10. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING 115 Consent MOTION to Dismiss all causes of action against CLINT SMITH. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/30/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 61 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/23/10. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER ALLOWING MENTAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF. Defendants' MOTION 75 to Compel Psychiatric Examination of Plaintiff is TERMINATED and the hearing set for 6/24/10 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/14/10. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 102 Second Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 44 Defendant Willits Unified School District's Motion for Summary Judgment. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 65 Ex Parte Application (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 14, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/7/10. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REFERRING 40 Letter and All Discovery Disputes to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 2, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING 33 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration and SETTING Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 16, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 19 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re 29 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 23, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 23 Stipulated Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 20, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/4/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/7/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING 9 Stipulation selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/30/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Willits Charter School et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: J. David Nick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen D
Represented By: J. David Nick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willits Charter School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Rulison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?