Harrington v. City of Newark
Plaintiff: Michael Harrington
Defendant: City of Newark
Case Number: 3:2009cv03787
Filed: August 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/7/2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. Given the proximity of the resulting hearing date to the Pretrial Conference, there is no assurance the parties will be able to meaningfully prepare and submit their pretria l filings in advance of the Pretrial Conference. Accordingly, the stipulation is denied without prejudice to further discussion at the Status Conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 15, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 29, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 12, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO COMPLETE MEDIATION. The February 12, 2010 deadline for the parties to complete mediation is extended until March 31, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 19, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER APPROVING NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEYS. Arkady Itkin is substituted as counsel for plaintiff in place and stead of Mark C. Thomas. The substitution shall not by itself constitute good cause to continue any pretrial or trial date. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 26, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/7/2009. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SELECTING ADR PROCESS. The parties shall participate in mediation within 90 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 16, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrington v. City of Newark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Harrington
Represented By: Mark C. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Newark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?