Sheehan v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: Teresa Sheehan
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Heather Fong, Kimberly Reynolds and Katherine Holder
Case Number: 3:2009cv03889
Filed: August 25, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2017 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/16/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017)
October 5, 2016 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING FILING. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/4/2016. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
July 22, 2016 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING FRANCES SHEEHAN TO PERSONALLY APPEAR AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/22/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
July 11, 2016 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting: 116 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 114 Clerk's Notice, STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING AUGUST 2, 2016 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE filed by Katherine Holder, et al. Pretrial Conference reset for 8/4/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/8/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
April 28, 2016 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 110 Motion for Reconsideration. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 20, 2016 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion for Summary Judgment. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
May 9, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/9/2011. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
November 22, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/22/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
June 29, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 22 Amended MOTION Administrative re 19 Joint MOTION to Continue JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND MODIFY PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER filed by Katherine Holder, City and County of San Francisco, Kimberly Reynolds, H eather Fong, Motions terminated: 19 Joint MOTION to Continue Motions due by 1/20/2011. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 3/25/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 4/25/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/25/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
November 23, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to continue CMC re 8 Stipulation, filed by Katherine Holder, City and County of San Francisco, Kimberly Reynolds, Heather Fong Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2009 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/23/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheehan v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Sheehan
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?