Moye v. City & County of San Francisco
Plaintiff: Malinka Tacuma Wade Moye
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco
Case Number: 3:2009cv03892
Filed: August 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION AND REQUIRING PREFILING REVIEW. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/21/09. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE REQUEST TO SHOW VIDEOTAPE. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 10, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re C-09-5464 CW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/1/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/22/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moye v. City & County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malinka Tacuma Wade Moye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?