United States of America v. Approximately $118,820 and $34,000 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $118,820 and $34,000 in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2009cv03963
Filed: August 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 841 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 Status Report filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER CONTINUING STAY AND RESETTING CMC TO 3/2/12 re 32 Status Report filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/9/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CIVIL STANDING ORDER for U.S. District Judge Edward M. Chen. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re 26 Status Report filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/27/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC TO 6/1/11 re 24 Status Report filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/16/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 Status Report filed by United States of America Case Management Conference reset for 3/23/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/14/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re 20 Status Report filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/15/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDING AND RESETTING CMC re 17 Proposed Order filed by United States of America Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/20/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting cmc from 3/3/10 to 4/21/10 14 Joint Case Management Statement filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/1/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $118,820 and $34,000 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Natalie K. Wight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $118,820 and $34,000 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?