December 19, 2011 |
Filing
111
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Immersion Corporation, Ralph Edward Clenton Richardson, Richard Vogel, Stephen M. Ambler, Victor A. Viegas against Frank Hodges, John P. Loos. Defendants motion to dismiss the Amended Consolidated Complaint is hereby GRANTED, and the Amended Consolidated Complaint is hereby DISMISSED. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
|
December 16, 2011 |
Filing
110
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 16, 2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing
109
ORDER VACATING DECEMBER 9, 2011 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT. Having read and considered the papers filed in support of and in opposition to the motion, the Court deems the matter suitable for decision thereon, and vacates the hearing scheduled for December 9, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 7, 2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
|
October 17, 2011 |
Filing
108
ORDER CONTINUING THE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT. The hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Consolidated Complaint currently set for October 28, 2011 is continued to December 9, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 17, 2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
|
August 3, 2011 |
Filing
99
ORDER RE: STIPULATION MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Pursuant to stipulation, plaintiff shall file opposition by September 7, 2011; Defendants shall reply by October 14, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/3/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
|
June 7, 2011 |
Filing
92
ORDER RE: STIPULATION MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR RESPONSE TO AMENDED COMPLAINT. Pursuant to stipulation, defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by July 1, 2011. Plaintiff shall file opposition, if any, by August 16, 2011. Defendants shall file a reply by September 16, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 6/7/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
|
April 14, 2011 |
Filing
89
ORDER RE: STIPULATION (I) EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING LEAD PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT AND (II) SETTING FORTH A BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint no later than April 29, 2011. D efendants shall respond no later than June 13, 2011. Plaintiff shall file opposition, if any, no later than July 28, 2011. Defendants shall reply no later than August 29, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/14/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
|
March 11, 2011 |
Filing
87
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT. Granting 70 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
|
November 2, 2010 |
Filing
86
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for November 12, 2010 and Joint Case Management Statement deadline currently set for November 5, 2010 are vacated and will be rescheduled at a later time after the Court rules on Defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/2/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
|
October 25, 2010 |
Filing
84
ORDER VACATING OCTOBER 29, 2010 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT. Having read and considered the papers filed in support of and in opposition to the motion, the Court deems the matter suitable for decision thereon, and vacates the hearing scheduled for October 29, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/25/2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
|
June 9, 2010 |
Filing
69
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR A ONE-WEEK EXTENSION TO FILE MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT. Defendants' motion to dismiss shall be due on June 15, 2010. Lead plaintiff's opposition shall be due on August 16, 2010. Defendants' reply shall be due on September 27, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 9, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
|
April 20, 2010 |
Filing
67
ORDER RE: SCHEDULE FOR RESPONSES TO CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT. Richard Vogel is a "defendant" within the terms of the January 12, 2010 order, and the briefing schedule therein applies equally to him. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 20, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
|
April 8, 2010 |
Filing
62
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from April 30, 2010 to November 12, 2010. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than November 5, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 8, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
|
January 12, 2010 |
Filing
59
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR FILING OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT AND RESPONSES THERETO. Lead plaintiff shall file a Consolidated Complaint no later than 60 days after the anticipated restatement is filed with the SEC but in no event later than June 30, 20 10. The deadline for defendants to move, answer or otherwise respond shall be 60 days after the Consolidated Complaint is filed. In the event defendants move to dismiss, lead plaintiff shall filed his opposition no later than 60 days after such motion is filed, and defendants shall file any reply no later than 40 days after such opposition is filed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 12, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
|
December 21, 2009 |
Filing
57
ORDER CLOSING CONSOLIDATED CASES FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. The following cases are closed for statistical purposes only: Posner v. Immersion Corp., Case No. 09-4118 MMC, Buell v. Immersion Corp., Case No. 09-4561 MMC, and Benson v. Immersion Cor p., Case No. 09-4744 MMC. Nothing contained in this order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of any action, and, should further proceedings therein become necessary or desirable, any party may initiate them in the same manner as if this order had not been entered.Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 21, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
|
December 16, 2009 |
Filing
54
ORDER VACATING DECEMBER 18, 2009 HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 16, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
|
November 30, 2009 |
Filing
49
ORDER GRANTING 43 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY IRA M. PRESS PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 30, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
|
November 18, 2009 |
Filing
40
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DAVID A. P. BROWER PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
|
November 16, 2009 |
Filing
38
RELATED CASE ORDER: Case # C 09-5137 SBA, Mello v. Richardson, et al. is related to case # C 09-4073 MMC, Hodges v. Immersion Corporation, et al. and those cases that were found to be related thereto by order dated October 19, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 16, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
|
October 19, 2009 |
Filing
20
RELATED CASE ORDER. Case # C 09-4073 MMC (Hodges v. Immersion Corporation, et al.) is related to the following cases: C 09-4118 PJH (Posner v. Immersion Corporation, et al.); C 09-4291 RS (Bilodeau v. Viegas, et al.); C 09-4412 JW (Barrios v. Immers ion Corporation, et al.); C 09-4561 CRB (Buell v. Viegas, et al.); C 09-4599 RS (Semelis v. Richardson, et al.); C 09-4744 HRL (Benson v. Immersion Corp., et al.). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 19, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
|