El Centro Foods, Inc. v. Food All The Time, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: El Centro Foods, Inc.
Defendant: Food All The Time, Inc., Victor M. Perez and Raymond Klein
Case Number: 3:2009cv04106
Filed: September 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED: 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by El Centro Foods, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/8/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER CONTINUING CMC re: 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2016. Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/22/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CMC re 87 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2015. Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/17/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2015. Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/13/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION AND AMENDED ORDER (Corrects date of CMC and also date that CMC Statement is due). Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/26/2015. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2015)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REOPEN CASE re: 72 Request to Restore Case to Active Calendar filed by El Centro Foods, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 10/30/2014. Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/9/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/18/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/7/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re 63 Notice (Other) filed by El Centro Foods, Inc. The parties shall file a stipulation for dismissal or joint status report by 5/26/2014. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/12/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT BY JANUARY 23, 2014. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/13/2014. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re 59 Status Report filed by El Centro Foods, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/21/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR MORE TIME TO SETTLE CASE re 57 Status Report filed by El Centro Foods, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/17/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDERGRANTING REQUEST FOR MORE TIME TO FINALIZE SETTLEMENT DOCUMENTS re 55 Status Report filed by El Centro Foods, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/17/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re 53 Status Report filed by El Centro Foods, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/17/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER - Status Report due by 1/16/2013.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/9/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER - Status Report due by 10/16/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/20/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Status Report due by 7/16/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/13/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Status Report due by 3/16/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/16/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Status Report due by 9/16/2011.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/17/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Status Report due by 6/16/2011.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/6/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RE CASE STATUS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/14/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Status Report due by 11/17/2010.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/22/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Counterclaims re 34 Stipulation filed by El Centro Foods, Inc.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/2/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIMS re 32 Stipulation filed by El Centro Foods, Inc.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/17/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order Extending Time to Respond to Counterclaims re 30 Stipulation filed by El Centro Foods, Inc.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/3/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER VACATING CMC; ORDER RE STATUS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/21/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CONTINUING CMC & RELATED DEADLINES re 15 Stipulation filed by El Centro Foods, Inc.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/15/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND; ORDER CONTINUING CMC re 13 Stipulation filed by El Centro Foods, Inc.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/8/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re 11 Stipulation filed by El Centro Foods, Inc.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/29/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONTINUING CMC; ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re 9 Stipulation filed by El Centro Foods, Inc.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/7/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/13/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El Centro Foods, Inc. v. Food All The Time, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: El Centro Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Milord A. Keshishian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food All The Time, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor M. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?