Singh v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Deepansha Singh
Defendant: United States of America, Golden Gate Bridge and Transportation District and Joshua Wozman
Case Number: 3:2009cv04108
Filed: September 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 97 Stipulation filed by Deepansha Singh. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/18/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CMC AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/24/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 10/18/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING JURY TRIAL re 68 Stipulation filed by Deepansha Singh. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/26/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE AND HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT re 64 Stipulation, filed by Golden Gate Bridge and Transportation District, Deepansha Singh. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/19/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER APPROVING PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR'S COMPROMISE AS TO DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, ETC. re 60 Stipulation, filed by Deepansha Singh. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/15/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 42 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANTS' DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS HEARING re 32 Stipulation filed by Golden Gate Bridge and Transportation District. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/30/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FROM 4/28/10 to 5/5/10 at 10:30 a.m. 29 Stipulation filed by Golden Gate Bridge and Transportation District. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/12/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER resetting CMC from 12/8/09 to 1/20/10 21 filed by Deepansha Singh. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/3/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re 3 Stipulation filed by Golden Gate Bridge and Transportation District extending time to answer. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/23/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deepansha Singh
Represented By: Ellen Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Gate Bridge and Transportation District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Wozman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?