United States Of America v. Approximately $144.001 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Approximately $144.001 in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2009cv04182
Filed: September 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING 101 Stipulated Judgment of Forfeiture and Order Dismissing the Instant Action. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/17/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 99 Request to Reschedule the CMC. Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/6/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING 97 REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/25/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013) Modified on 3/25/2013 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER CONTINUING Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2013. Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2013 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 3, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING 90 Request to Lift Stay. Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2012. Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 29, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 81 Motion for Release of Funds. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING 82 Stipulation RE: SCHEDULING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/19/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER To Continue the Stay and To Extend the Status Report Filing Period F rom 45 to 90 Days. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/25/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING 68 Administrative Motion To Continue the Stay). Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/12/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME NUNC PRO TUNC; AND CONTINUING THE STAY IN THE INSTANT CASE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/25/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING 55 REQUEST TO CONTINUE STAY. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/22/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING 50 Status Report and Request to Continue Stay. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 10, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING 44 CONTINUANCE OF STAY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/20/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING 33 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/22/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 20 Motion to Stay; GRANTING 28 Motion to Seal. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 18 Stipulation to Vacate the Case Management Conference Hearing on Motion to Stay is set for 5/14/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/29/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 16 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 18, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/16/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Civil Standing ORDER (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Approximately $144.001 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Brian Joseph Stretch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $144.001 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?