January 15, 2016 |
Filing
378
ORDER DISMISSING CONSOLIDATED ACTIONS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/15/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
|
November 24, 2015 |
Filing
373
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2016. Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/24/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
|
August 11, 2015 |
Filing
359
ORDER GRANTING 358 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/20/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/11/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015) Modified on 8/11/2015 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
|
July 20, 2015 |
Filing
356
ORDER GRANTING 355 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/20/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
|
May 14, 2015 |
Filing
343
ORDER memorializing agreements and orders at settlement conference call (entered with the parties' permission on the call) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
|
April 21, 2015 |
Filing
336
ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2015. Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/21/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
|
September 16, 2014 |
Filing
333
ORDER GRANTING 332 STIPULATION And Motion for Administrative Relief to Stay Civil Action as to All Parties. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/16/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
|
August 28, 2013 |
Filing
324
ORDER GRANTING 323 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/28/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
|
April 24, 2013 |
Filing
320
AMENDED ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. A settlement conference is scheduled with Anna Erickson White and Jordon Eth ONLY for May 20, 2013, at 4:00 p.m., 15th Floor, Courtroom C, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA 94102. The court allots one hour for the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/24/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
|
February 24, 2013 |
Filing
315
ORDER re (312 in 3:09-cv-04208-JSW) Notice (Other), filed by Daniel Gautsch, (313 in 3:09-cv-04208-JSW) MOTION to Appear by Telephone Defendant Thomas S. Wu's Request for Excusal of Personal Attendance and Request for Telephonic Appeareance at Settlement Conference filed by Thomas S. Wu Order re telephonic appearances and logistics (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 2/24/2013)
|
November 13, 2012 |
Filing
302
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY STAY. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/13/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
|
November 1, 2012 |
Filing
300
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/1/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
|
August 29, 2012 |
Filing
273
ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Case Management Statement due by 10/26/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/29/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
|
July 3, 2012 |
Filing
266
ORDER SETTING AND CONTINUING HEARING as to 252 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Third Amended Complaint, 263 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Third Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/3/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
|
May 31, 2012 |
Filing
258
AMENDED ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/31/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
|
May 30, 2012 |
Filing
257
ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/30/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
|
February 15, 2012 |
Filing
219
ORDER GRANTING 218 Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Craig On. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/15/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2012)
|
December 8, 2011 |
Filing
216
ORDER GRANTING 215 Stipulation Re: Filing of Third Amended Complaint and Response Thereto. Amended Pleadings due by 1/9/2012. Motions due by 2/23/2012. Replies due by 5/9/2012. Responses due by 4/9/2012. Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/8/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
|
September 16, 2011 |
Filing
205
ORDER GRANTING 204 Stipulation Continuing Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/16/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
|
June 16, 2011 |
Filing
197
ORDER GRANTING 196 Stipulation EXTENDING TIME TO FILE SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT; ESTABLISHING BRIEFING SCHEDULE; AND ADJUSTING RELATED DEADLINES: Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/16/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
|
April 28, 2011 |
Filing
194
ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
|
April 15, 2011 |
Filing
193
ORDER GRANTING MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record: Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/15/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
|
March 11, 2011 |
Filing
190
STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2011. Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/11/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
|
February 16, 2011 |
Filing
188
ORDER Vacating Hearing on Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 02/15/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
|
November 15, 2010 |
Filing
153
ORDER Regarnding 151 Stipulation to Extend Page Limits. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 15, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
|
October 5, 2010 |
Filing
142
ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 141 Stipulation Extending Time to File Responsive Pleading to the Consolidated Amended Complaint and Adjusting Related Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/5/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
|
May 17, 2010 |
Filing
137
ORDER GRANTING 136 Stipulation EXTENDING TIME TO FILE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ADJUSTING RELATED DEADLINES. Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/17/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
|
February 12, 2010 |
Filing
127
ORDER Granting 125 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 12, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
|
January 27, 2010 |
Filing
124
ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying (28) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; denying (30) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; denying (39) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; granting (43) Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying (43) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; granting (49) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (49) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; denying (14) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead C ounsel ; denying (24) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel in case 3:09-cv-04208-JSW; denying (10) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; denying (20) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel in case 3:09-cv-04429-J SW; denying (8) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; denying (18) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; granting (22) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:09-cv-04449-JSW; denying (8) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; denying (18) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel in case 3:09-cv-04505-JSW; denying (11) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; denying (21) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel in case 3:09-cv-04513-JSW (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
|
January 26, 2010 |
Filing
123
ORDER Granting 120 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611041411.) filed by DeKalb County Pension Fund. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 26, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
|
December 23, 2009 |
Filing
110
ORDER Resetting Hearing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 23, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
|
December 1, 2009 |
Filing
77
ORDER to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 1, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
|
October 22, 2009 |
Filing
11
ORDER GRANTING (9 in 3:09-cv-04513-JSW) (8 in 3:09-cv-04429-JSW) (9 in 3:09-cv-04492-JSW) Stipulation EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/22/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
|