Shaffer v. State of California et al
Petitioner: David Shaffer
Respondent: State of California, County of Santa Cruz and Paul M Marigonda
Case Number: 3:2009cv04226
Filed: September 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JUDGMENT: This action is dismissed without prejudice to petitioner filing a new habeas action after he exhausts his state court remedies for all the claims he wants to present in a federal habeas petition. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/27/09 ORDERING that this case is TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California.(Dillon, M)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/12/09 ordering petitioner is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file a petition that complies with the requirements of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases, the Federal Rul es of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Practice. Petitioner shall also submit within 30 days from the date of service of this order, the application to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the clerk of the court or the filing fee in the amount of $5.00. The clerk of the court shall send petitioner the court's form for filing a petition for writ of habeas corpus and the application to proceed IFP by a prisoner. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaffer v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: County of Santa Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paul M Marigonda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?