Bel Conor International, LTD. v. Solta Medical, Inc.

Plaintiff: Bel Conor International, LTD.
Defendant: Solta Medical, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv04391
Filed: September 17, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order 37 ORDER GRANTING 35 Stipulation to Continue CMC. Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2011. Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/24/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order 34 ORDER GRANTING 33 Request to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/31/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 32 ORDER CONTINUING Case Management Conference and CONTINUING Stay. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 8, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order 17 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bel Conor International, LTD. v. Solta Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bel Conor International, LTD.
Represented By: Michael A. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solta Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?