Miranda v. First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Rose Miranda
Defendant: First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company and Olympus America, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan
Mediator: R. Bradford Huss
Case Number: 3:2009cv04452
Filed: September 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 63 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. Stipulation filed by Rose Miranda ***Civil Case Terminated.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/12/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting in part and denying in part 46 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. As limited by the Court, Defendants are ordered to supplement their discovery responses to identify and produce the requested documents within fourteen (14) days of the filing of this order. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting in part and denying in part 37 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order re: depositions. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 48 TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL, TRIAL BRIEFING, AND TRIAL DATES AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Stipulation filed by Rose Miranda. Bench Trial set for 10/11/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/11/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 BRIEFING ORDER re 46 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel. The Court sets the following briefing schedule: 1) Defendants' opposition is due by the close of business on April 15, 2011 and is limited to fifteen (15) double spaced pages; and 2) Pla intiff's reply is due by the close of business on April 20, 2011 and is limited to ten (10) double spaced pages. Plaintiff's motion to compel will be submitted on the papers and the May 10, 2011 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on April 7, 2011. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 40 TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES FOR 60 DAYS. Bench Trial set for 8/8/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/1/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Further Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/27/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 27 TO CONTINUE MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/12/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miranda v. First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Miranda
Represented By: Brent Dorian Brehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Dennis J. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Dennis J. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olympus America, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Dennis J. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: R. Bradford Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?