Jacks v. Chevron Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Richard O. Jacks
Defendant: Chevron Corporation, Paul Moran and Kevin Hoffer
Case Number: 3:2009cv04523
Filed: September 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 WRIT of Execution issued as to Judgment Debtor Richard O. Jacks. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING 86 Stipulation to Continue Briefing and Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 9/23/2011. Replies due by 10/14/2011. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/12/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING 73 Stipulation to Extend Last Day for Expert Witness Disclosure. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/4/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE ORDER RE: 52 MOTION Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge and 54 MOTION Disclosure of Discovery Information - Witness Names. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/22/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE OF REFERENCE, TIME AND PLACE OF HEARING. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 5/20/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/27/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING 30 MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR COMPLETION OF MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. Whit on 10/15/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 25 Stipulation and 23 MOTION to Continue Deadline for Mediation.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/17/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re 21 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 27, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/10/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacks v. Chevron Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard O. Jacks
Represented By: Pamela Yvette Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Hoffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?