Fre et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Tsegereda Fre and Mehreteab Araya
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2009cv04543
Filed: September 25, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Laporte on 9/15/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
July 13, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 22 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Laporte on 7/13/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
May 28, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 19 Amended Document filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Laporte on 5/28/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
December 31, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO APRIL 6, 2010 Signed by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/31/2009. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fre et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tsegereda Fre
Represented By: Ira Leshin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mehreteab Araya
Represented By: Ira Leshin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?