Cortez v. Kane
Petitioner: Javier Cortez
Respondent: A. P. Kane
Case Number: 3:2009cv04549
Filed: September 25, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE denying 18 Motion for Reconsideration.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/24/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING PETITIONS FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND CERTIFICATES OF APPEALABILITY; DENYING PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/18/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/27/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortez v. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Javier Cortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A. P. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?