Textscape LLC v. Adobe Systems Incorporated
Plaintiff: Textscape LLC
Defendant: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2009cv04550
Filed: September 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 62 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 70 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman Denying re 61 Administrative Motion to File Document Under Seal. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/7/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/4/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 33 Motion to Seal; denying 46 Motion (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman Granting re 51 Adobe's Administrative Request to Bring Equipment into the Courtroom on June 2, 2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re 38 Stipulation filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/3/2010. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/23/2010 Regarding Summary Judgment Schedule. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/1/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Enlargement of Time Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/29/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER - Cases are NOT RELATED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/29/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Textscape LLC v. Adobe Systems Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Textscape LLC
Represented By: Corby R. Vowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?