Ward v. Equilon Enterprises LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kent Ward
Defendant: Equilon Enterprises LLC and Shell Oil Products Company LLC
Case Number: 3:2009cv04565
Filed: September 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2012 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 9/27/2012 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 10/9/2012 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 10/9/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/26/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 60 FOR FIFTH EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY AND MEDIATION DEADLINES AND TO RESCHEDULE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/29/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER RE: BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/16/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 51 FOR THIRD EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY AND MEDIATION DEADLINES AND THE RESCHEDULE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/3/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AMENDED ORDER re 44 Order. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/4/11. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 38 FOR SECOND EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY AND MEDIATION DEADLINES AND TO RESCHEDULE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/26/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/20/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE: 34 CORRECTED ORDER REFERRING MATTER TO MAGISTRATE FOR DISCOVERY PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/5/11. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND MEDIATION DEADLINES AND TO RESCHEDULE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Joint Case Management Conference Statement due 4/7/11. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/8/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/4/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISCHARGING 17 Order to Show Cause (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the action should not be remanded to superior court. Show Cause Response due by 1/15/2010.. Signed by Judge Walker on January 8, 2010. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Equilon Enterprises LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Ward
Represented By: Steger P. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equilon Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Products Company LLC
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?