Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. ABM Industries Inc.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: ABM Industries Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv04593
Filed: September 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER RE CONSENT DECREE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/13/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/15/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 AMENDED ORDER SCHEDULING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FOR JULY 11, 2011 AT 3:00 P.M. Please disregard 116 .. Signed by Judge Beeler on 7/8/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINES AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/6/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDERING DIRECTING TIMOTHY BREKKE TO APPEAR AT JUNE 9, 2011 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beeler on 6/6/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 96 Motion for Extension of Time to File (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying re 73 Motion for Protective Order. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman vacating hearing 70 Motion to Sever (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/18/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER SCHEDULING JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/3/2010. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MEDIATION DEADLINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/7/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 18 Motion to Dismiss (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Deadline for Filing Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, or in the alternative, for More Definite Statemen re 26 MOTION re 25 Memorandum in Opposition, REQUEST FOR RELIEF DUE TO ERRONEOUS FILING; DECLARATION OF CINDY OHARA; [PROPOSED] ORDER Filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/12/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/23/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TO EXTEND DEALINE FOR FILING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND INTIAL DISCLOSURES re 15 Stipulation filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/5/2010. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/26/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/17/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. ABM Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Cindy O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?