Wordtech Systems, Inc. v. Microboards Manufacturing, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Wordtech Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Microboards Manufacturing, L.L.C., Microboards Technology, L.L.C., Octave Systems, Inc, Vinpower, Inc. and Disc Makers, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv04612
Filed: March 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM AND DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER vacating claim construction hearing re 75 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010) Modified on 10/21/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 8/6/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER extending ADR deadline and the cmc to 11/5/10 @ 3 p.m. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING REEXAMINATION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting extension of the deadline to file response to 2nd Amended Complaint. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER VACATING HEARING AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re 29 . (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER referring case to mediation re 22 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wordtech Systems, Inc. v. Microboards Manufacturing, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wordtech Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Christian John Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microboards Manufacturing, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jen-Feng Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microboards Technology, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jen-Feng Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Octave Systems, Inc
Represented By: Jen-Feng Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vinpower, Inc.
Represented By: Jen-Feng Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disc Makers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?