Moore v. Contra Costa College District
Plaintiff: Robert Moore
Defendant: Contra Costa College District
Case Number: 3:2009cv04781
Filed: October 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:2003 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 9/15/2011.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/30/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER VACATING MEDIATION REFFERAL, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/6/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011) Modified on 4/6/2011 (cmf, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 31 Motion to Dismiss (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER PERMITTING DEFENDANT TO FILE AMENDED REPLY. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/12/2011. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DISCHARGING SECOND OSC; ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING re 31 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Contra Costa College District. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/16/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 12/16/2010.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/1/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER FOR DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES re 32 Request for Judicial Notice filed by Contra Costa College District, 31 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Contra Costa College District. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/10/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING re 29 Letter filed by Contra Costa College District. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/1/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED ORDER re 25 Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/26/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING IN PART & DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS re 18 Notice (Other) filed by Contra Costa College District. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/23/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DISCHARGING re 20 Order to Show Cause, ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING RE 18 Notice (Other) filed by Contra Costa College District. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/24/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 7 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/12/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY re 7 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Contra Costa College District's Motion to Dismiss filed by Contra Costa College District. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/11/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER VACATING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/28/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Contra Costa College District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa College District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?