Madrid v. City Of Oakland et al
Plaintiff: Jonathon Madrid
Defendant: City Of Oakland, Howard Jordan, County of Alameda, Gregory Ahern and Dalen Randa
Case Number: 3:2009cv04819
Filed: October 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 38 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 40 Motion for Summary Judgment. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT MRI RESULTS TO DEFENDANTS; ORDER SCHEDULING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/10/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER EXCUSING GREGORY AHERN AND DALEN RANDA FROM ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 27 Letter filed by County of Alameda, Dalen Randa, Gregory Ahern. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/4/2010. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 Stipulation EXTENDING DEADLINE TO COMMENCE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/16/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AND IMPOSING SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/25/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/10/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to Show Cause re Failure to Appear. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 5, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madrid v. City Of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathon Madrid
Represented By: Steven Robert Yourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dalen Randa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?