Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local Union No. 3, AFL-CIO et al v. Deason et al
Plaintiff: Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local Union No. 3, AFL-CIO, Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Pension Trust, Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Tile Industry Promotion Fund of Northern California Inc., Tile Employers Contract Administration Fund and Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Pension Fund
Defendant: Brian J. Deason, Surety Company of the Pacific and American Contractors Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv04825
Filed: October 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/19/2010 re 19 Stipulation for Dismissal of Surety Company of the Pacific & American Contractors Indemnity Company Without Prejudice. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST BRIAN J. DEASON re 17 . Signed by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/2/2010.: Plaintiffs do hereby have judgment against Brian J. Deason in the amount of $13,692, inclusive of attorneys' fees & costs, plus interest at the annual rate of 10% calculated from the date judgment is entered by the Court until paid. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/7/2010 Granting re 8 Letter Request to Appear Telephonically. edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting re 6 Application to Appear Telephonically Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 4, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local Union No. 3, AFL-CIO et al v. Deason et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local Union No. 3, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Kent Khtikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Pension Trust
Represented By: Kent Khtikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Kent Khtikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Kent Khtikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tile Industry Promotion Fund of Northern California Inc.
Represented By: Kent Khtikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tile Employers Contract Administration Fund
Represented By: Kent Khtikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Pension Fund
Represented By: Kent Khtikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian J. Deason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surety Company of the Pacific
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Contractors Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?