Lake County Grapevine Nursery Operations, LLC et al v. American Nursery, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lake County Grapevine Nursery Operations, LLC, Lake County Grapevine Nursery, LLC, Eckhard Kaesekamp and Nevada Viewpointe West
Defendant: American Nursery, LLC and Joachim Hollerith
Case Number: 3:2009cv04877
Filed: October 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The clerk is DIRECTED to terminate all motions and close the file. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why defendants' motion to shorten time should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 6/11/2010. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER directing parties to inform the court whether they consent to referral to Magistrate Judge Vadas. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR A STAY PENDING ARBITRATION re doc 32 . On or before 7/16/2010 and six-month intervals thereafter, the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court of the status of the arbitration. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/6/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lake County Grapevine Nursery Operations, LLC et al v. American Nursery, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake County Grapevine Nursery Operations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake County Grapevine Nursery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eckhard Kaesekamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevada Viewpointe West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Nursery, LLC
Represented By: Ronald Joseph Kohut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joachim Hollerith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?