Perry -v- Astrue
Plaintiff: Michael Eugene Perry
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2009cv04908
Filed: October 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 34 Motion for Attorney Fees (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Settling Attorney's Fees re 32 Proposed Order filed by Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 12/8/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REMANDING CASE FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/6/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SECOND ORDER FOR DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/22/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER FOR DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/14/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER EXTENDING RESPONSE DEADLINE re 24 Proposed Order filed by Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/30/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY re 22 First MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Michael Eugene Perry. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/26/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Extending Time to File Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re 20 Stipulation filed by Michael Eugene Perry. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/21/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Extending Plaintiff's Time to File Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re 18 Stipulation filed by Michael Eugene Perry. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/17/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION re 16 Stipulation filed by Michael Eugene Perry. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/19/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER VACATING OSC re 6 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/2/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/10/2009 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 12/3/2009.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/19/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/10/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/19/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry -v- Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Eugene Perry
Represented By: Dolly Marlo Trompeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?