Flowers v. Pacific Maritime Association
Plaintiff: Elliott Flowers
Defendant: Pacific Maritime Association
Case Number: 3:2009cv04909
Filed: October 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 30:181 Environment: Review of Agency Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/24/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER extending time to respond to first amended complaint re 16 Stipulation filed by Pacific Maritime Association. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/25/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to reset CMC re 10 Case Management Statement filed by Elliott Flowers Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2010 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/6/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT WITH RECOMMENDATION THAT IFP BE DENIED. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/26/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flowers v. Pacific Maritime Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliott Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Maritime Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?