Board of Trustees of the Automotive Industires Welfare Fund et al v. Capitol Expressway Ford, Inc.
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Automotive Industires Welfare Fund, Automotive Industries Pension Fund and Jim Beno
Defendant: Capitol Expressway Ford, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv04945
Filed: October 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT re 37 Stipulation, filed by Board of Trustees of the Automotive Industires Welfare Fund, Automotive Industries Pension Fund, Jim Beno. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/2/11. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 35 Case Management Statement filed by Board of Trustees of the Automotive Industires Welfare Fund, Automotive Industries Pension Fund, Jim Beno. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/10/11. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEYS re 26 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Board of Trustees of the Automotive Industires Welfare Fund, Automotive Industries Pension Fund, Jim Beno. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/21/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Automotive Industires Welfare Fund et al v. Capitol Expressway Ford, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Automotive Industires Welfare Fund
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Automotive Industries Pension Fund
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Beno
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Expressway Ford, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?