Chanel, Inc. v. Lin et al

Plaintiff: Chanel, Inc.
Defendant: Xiuyin Lin, Shiguan Wang and Zhongxioubin
Case Number: 3:2009cv04996
Filed: October 20, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff and agaisnt defendants. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
April 15, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 44 Letter filed by Chanel, Inc., for Stephen Gaffigan to appear telephonically on 4/16/10 at 9:30 AM. Court to initiate the phone contact. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/15/2010. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
February 24, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 38 Notice (Other)/Request Re: Case Management Conference filed by Chanel, Inc. Case mangement conference date of 3/12/10 at 1:30 PM has been taken off calendar. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/24/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
January 26, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 23 Notice (Other) filed by Chanel, Inc., to Continue Case Management Conference currently set for 1/29/10 at 1:30 PM. Case Management Conference re-set for 3/12/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/26/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chanel, Inc. v. Lin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanel, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth E. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiuyin Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiguan Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhongxioubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?