AT&T Mobility LLC et al v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Plaintiff: AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Services, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc., Pacific Bell Telephone Company, AT&T Operations, Inc., AT&T Datacomm, Inc. and Southwestern Bell Telephone Company
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation, Au Optronics Corporation America, Inc, Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Nexgen Mediatech, Inc. ("Nexgen"), Nexgen Mediatech USA, Inc., Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd., Tatung Company of America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Epson Electronics America, Inc., Hannstar Display Corporation, LG Display Co., Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.,, Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba Mobile Display Technology Co., Ltd. and Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv04997
Filed: October 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/2/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 7806 Stipulation :re Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER re Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/30/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DOWNSTREAM PASS-ON 6178 6338 7069 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 424 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 422 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, filed by AT&T Datacomm, Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company, Pacific Bell Telephone Company, AT&T Corp., AT&T Operations, Inc., Sharp Corporation and Sharp Electronics Corporation terminated.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/20/12. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING MOBILE PHONE DISPLAYS 6212 6372 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT SANYO CONSUMER ELECTRONICS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DISMISSING AT&T'S CLAIMS 5875 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO NONPARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS 6209 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER FOR FURTHER DECLARATIONS RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO PURCHASES OF PANELS MADE BY SUPPOSED CONSPIRATORS NOT ALLEGED IN THE COMPLAINTS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DOWNSTREAM PASS-ON (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMERAS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTERS ORDER STRIKING EXPERT REPORTS 6668 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER granting stipulation of dismissal 6731 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/18/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER RE: MOTIONS CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR 10/3/12 AND 10/5/12 (SETTING NEW SCHEDULE, SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/13/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CHOICE-OF-LAW GROUNDS - AT&T MOBILITY, RADIOSHACK and COMPUSA 6082 6083 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; 281 282 in case 3:09-cv-04997-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER Granting Substitution of Counsel by CHUNGHWAY PICTURE TUBES. Signed by Judge SUSAN ILLSTON on 8/6/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012) Modified on 8/7/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL 6139 6142 6150 6162 6171 6172 6175 6180] 6181 6188 6191 6192 6200 6201 6202 6206 6211 6214 6241 6248 6252 6253 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/30/2012) (Entered: 07/30/2012) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME 284 285 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/25/12 Dismissal of Claims agains Tatung Co., and withdrawing Summary Judgment Motions set for 6/22/12. (Motions terminated: (136 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tatung Company of America, Inc., (187 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tatung Company of America, Inc., (5790 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tatung Company of America, Inc., (2 57 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) (149 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tatung Company of America, Inc., (342 in 3:09-cv-05840-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tatung Company of America, Inc., (166 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) L.L.C., Magnolia Hi-Fi, Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., (5547 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tatung Company of America, Inc. ("Tatung America").. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO DEFENDANT LG DISPLAYS COUNTERCLAIMS 5548 (see order for details). Signed by Judge Illston on 4/30/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (5419) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the undersigned DAPs, AGs, and LG Display, by and through their undersigned liaison counsel and subject to the concurrence of the Court, as follows:(1) The time for the undersigned DAPs and AGs served with LG Displays Motion to Amend to file their Oppositions to LG Displays Motion shall be extended to and including April 27, 2012. The DAPs shall file a single opposition brief to LG Displays Motion to Amend.(2) LG Displays time to file its Reply(ies) in support of its Motion shall be extended to and including May 8, 2012. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER For Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd., Tatung Company of America, Inc. ("Tatung America"). 5063 . Signed by Judge Illston on 3/15/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER GRANTING SAMSUNG SDI'S AND SANYO CONSUMER ELECTRONICS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER VACATING JANUARY 27, 2012 HEARING (AT&T MOBILITY) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER extending deadline to move to compel (#4532) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting extension of time to move to compel (#4416) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER re: extension of time to respond to interrog. and request for production (#4406) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO MOVE TO COMPEL (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER Order Extending Plaintiffs' Time to Move to Compel as to Certain Discovery by BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc., Good Guys, Inc., Kmart Corp, AT & T Corp., AT & T Datacomm, Inc., AT & T Mobility LLC, AT & T Operations, Inc., AT & T Services, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Newegg Inc., Old Comp Inc., Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Radioshack Corp., Sears, Roebuck and Co., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company, Target (4372) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER modifying fact discovery (#4296) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE TO COMPEL FILED BY SAMSUNG (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER extending extension of time to move to compel ((#4200) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER Re: AUO Depositions (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER TO MODIFY NOVEMBER 13, 2009 ORDER RE DEPONENTS ASSERTING THE FIFTH AMENDMENT PRIVILEGE AGAINST SELF-INCRIMINATION (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Re Extension of Time To Respond to Third Amended Complaint, Waiver of Service, and [Proposed] Order by AT&T Corp., AT&T Datacomm, Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Operations, Inc., AT&T Services, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc., Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Southwestern Bell Telephone Company (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting 106 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (w/Judge's signature) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying PRO HAC... see order for details (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF AT&T MOBILITY'S MOTION TO CERTIFY UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1292(b) (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting extension to answer (09-4997) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER reserving 11/3/10 @ 10:00 a.m. for motions to dismiss (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO AMEND (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AT&T Mobility LLC et al v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Christopher H. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T Corp.
Represented By: Christopher H. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher H. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher H. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Bell Telephone Company
Represented By: Christopher H. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T Operations, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher H. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T Datacomm, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher H. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company
Represented By: Christopher H. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Au Optronics Corporation America, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMO Japan Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexgen Mediatech, Inc. ("Nexgen")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexgen Mediatech USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatung Company of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannstar Display Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Mobile Display Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?